Lee, Andrew Wai Yuen (CPSO#: 84756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NHS - St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

NHS - Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

NHS - Welland Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
Phone: 905-378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew W. Y. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lee ( CPSO# 84756 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW WAI YUEN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011