Lee, Angela Yan-May (CPSO#: 63728)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Aug 2011