Lee, Angell Wei-Chou (CPSO#: 75644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Taiwan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 31 Aug 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELL WEI-CHOU LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2001