Lee, Ashley (CPSO#: 98059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

287 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A5T3
Canada
Phone: 5192715320
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lee Di Labio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Di Labio ( CPSO# 98706 )
Dr. A. Lee ( CPSO# 98059 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Room C8-114
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3269

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
287 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T3
Phone Number: (519) 271-5320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2015