Lee, Betty (CPSO#: 63539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58560
Fax: (905) 494-6614
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Finchgate Blvd
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: (905) 792-8440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Betty Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lee ( CPSO# 63539 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
320 - 40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 792-8440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETTY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1991