Lee, Bobby Sung (CPSO#: 72154)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jun 1998 to 21 Jun 1998
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006