Lee, Bonnie Po Yee (CPSO#: 66795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-1661
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. BPY Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lee ( CPSO# 66795 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BONNIE PO YEE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995