Lee, Chen (CPSO#: 59233)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 4055 St Catherine St W Montreal QC
Instructions: 514 932 7667
Date Received: 16 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017