Lee, Ching Sang (CPSO#: 77790)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 11 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004