Lee Choi, Kenneth (CPSO#: 32862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite 302
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 321-5667
Fax: (416) 321-9191
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dermatology
University Health Network
Western Division
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5G 7S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5952
Fax: (416) 603-2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Lee Choi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lee Choi ( CPSO# 32862 )

Business Address:
302 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 321-5667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH LEE CHOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE CHOI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987