Lee, Christina Dorothy (CPSO#: 86397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Helath Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5130
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.D. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lee ( CPSO# 86397 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA DOROTHY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 29 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2010 to 02 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010