Lee, Christine Hye Chong (CPSO#: 68110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Avenue East
424 Luke Wing
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6021
Fax: (905) 521-6083
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lee ( CPSO# 68110 )

Business Address:
424 Luke Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6143

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE HYE CHONG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1998