Lee, Christopher Wai-Kwok (CPSO#: 65062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
British Columbia Cancer Agency
Fraser Valley Centre
13750 96th Avenue
Surrey BC  V3V 1Z2
Phone: (604) 930-4017
Fax: (604) 587-4312

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WAI-KWOK LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1993