Lee, David Chi-Keung (CPSO#: 30036)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2001