Lee, David Hwei (CPSO#: 62120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Room 2025
Etherington Hall
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6803
Fax: (613) 533-6855
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lee ( CPSO# 62120 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Etherington Hall
Room 2025
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6803

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HWEI LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1991