Lee, Dig Sung (CPSO#: 26351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            (Undertaking 1 of 2)

            As from March 17, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Dig Sung Lee, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Lee to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                           DR. DIG SUNG LEE
                                              ("Dr. Lee")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Lee, certificate of registration number 26351, am a member of the
                  College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Lee, acknowledge that the College received complaints which led to
                  investigations, bearing File Numbers 103782 and 100007 (the
                  "Investigations"), into whether I engaged in professional misconduct
                  and/or am incompetent in my family practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Lee, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (5)   I, Dr. Lee, undertake that I will not practise medicine in Ontario until
                  each and every one of the following conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine. 
                  
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Lee, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward
                  a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number be
                  deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and
                  before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in
                  accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (7)   I, Dr. Lee, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (8)   I, Dr. Lee, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Lee, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practice, the ICR Committee may, among other things: 

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Lee, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the
                   provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Lee, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Lee, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Lee, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (14)  I, Dr. Lee, acknowledge that this Undertaking shall be posted on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Lee, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in 
                  effect:
                  
                        Dr. Lee was the subject of complaints which led to College
                        investigations into whether he engaged in professional misconduct
                        and/or is incompetent in his family practice. In the face of these
                        allegations, Dr. Lee has ceased to practise medicine in all
                        jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any
                        medical advice or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Lee, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (17)  I, Dr. Lee, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.


            (Undertaking 2 of 2)

            Effective February 23, 2016, Dr. Dig Sung Lee has undertaken to cease
            practicing medicine until such time as he has obtained a clinical Supervisor
            acceptable to the College in accordance with paragraphs 4 (e) and (f) of his
            Undertaking dated November 30, 2015.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dig Sung Lee to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 17, 2017:

Dr. Lee was the subject of complaints which led to College investigations into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Lee has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.