Lee, Edward Yoon-Seok (CPSO#: 83254)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Y.S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 17 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2006 to 16 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2015