Lee, Henderson (CPSO#: 62140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6212
Fax: (416) 469-6874
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

199 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 961-6044
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

66 Avenue Road
Suite #1
Toronto ON  M5R 2N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 922-4513
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Elements
195 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-7072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Spa Medica
66 Avenue Road
Suite #4
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 922-2868
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Cosmedical
York Mills Centre
20 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2P 2C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 449-9983
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Oakridges Cosmetic Surgery Center
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 401
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-1599
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lee ( CPSO# 62140 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Room J6100
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENDERSON LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991