Lee, Hon-Kai (CPSO#: 68866)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 29 Sep 1997 to 02 Nov 1997
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998