Lee, Jee-Yong John (CPSO#: 59466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Room 503
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44605
Fax: (905) 577-8267
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JJ Lee Medicine Professsional Coporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 59466 )

Business Address:
HHS General Site
Suite 503
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEE-YONG JOHN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2014