Lee, Jeffrey Wai-Kong (CPSO#: 77862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY WAI-KONG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007