Lee, John Stephen (CPSO#: 63996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Whitby Medical Centre
3975 Garden Street
Whitby ON  L1R 3A4
Phone: (905) 430-2400
Fax: (905) 430-1599
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2007

Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 63996 )

Business Address:
North Whitby Medical Centre
3975 Garden Street
Whitby ON  L1R 3A4
Phone Number: (905) 430-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. JOHN STEPHEN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992