Lee, John (CPSO#: 67018)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997