Lee, John (CPSO#: 78997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Otolaryngology
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, 8 Cardinal Carter
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5306
Fax: (416) 864-5469
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 78997 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
8 Cardinal Carter Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5306

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2009