Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lee, Joseph Siu-Kan (CPSO#: 31306)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 04 Jul 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 May 2007
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 09 May 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 08 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 2009
Summary:

On June 10, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Lee had committed acts of 
professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and that he engaged 
in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable and 
unprofessional.  
 
Dr. Lee was Patient A's gynaecologist. In the course of a medical examination, Dr. Lee sexually 
abused Patient A by placing his mouth on her breast, and made inappropriate sounds and 
comments concerning sexual practices. In the course of another medical examination, he made 
inappropriate comments about her breasts. 
 
On June 8, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Lee's Certificate of Registration for a period of six months, this 
      suspension to take effect 60 days after the date of this order. 
 
2.    The Registrar impose a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Lee's certificate of 
      registration, that Dr. Lee shall register for and complete, on the next available date, and in 
      any event within six months of the date of this Order, the College courses on 
      Understanding Boundary Issues and Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient 
      Relationship, and Medical Ethics and Informed Consent, and provide proof thereof to the 
      College. Upon providing proof of completion of these courses to the Registrar, this term, 
      condition and limitation shall be removed from Dr. Lee's certificate.  
 
3.    The Registrar impose a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Lee's certificate of 
      registration, for an indefinite period of time, that  
 
      (a)   Dr. Lee shall have a monitor (chaperone) present for all in-person professional 
            encounters with female patients, who shall be a member of a health profession 
            pursuant to the terms of the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, who is 
            acceptable to the College; 
 
      (b)   The monitor shall initial each chart entry contemporaneously with any in-person 
            professional encounter with Dr. Lee, and shall keep a log of each of Dr. Lee's 
            professional encounters that occur in her presence and shall provide the College 
            with a true copy of this log on a monthly basis; and 
 
      (c)   A sign shall be prominently displayed in Dr. Lee's office, in English and other 
            appropriate languages, stating that Dr. Lee is required to have a monitor present 
            for all in-person professional encounters with female patients.  
 
4.    The Registrar impose a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Lee's certificate of 
      registration that Dr. Lee shall immediately provide a signed consent allowing the College 
      to have access to his OHIP billings. Upon providing the signed consent, this term, 
      condition and limitation shall be removed from Dr. Lee's certificate. 
 
 
 
5.    The Registrar impose a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Lee's certificate of 
      registration, for an indefinite period of time that Dr. Lee shall submit to, and not interfere 
      with, unannounced or announced inspections of his office and practice and patient charts 
      by a College representative for the purpose of monitoring compliance with the terms of 
      this penalty order. 
 
6.    Dr. Lee shall reimburse the College for any funding provided to Patient A under the 
      program required under section 85.7 of the Code, and shall post an irrevocable letter of 
      credit or other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such amounts, 
      within 30 days of the date of this Order, in the amount of $13,130. 
 
7.    Dr. Lee shall pay to the College, within 60 days of the date of this Order, costs of the 
      hearing in the amount of $7,300. 
 
8.    Dr. Lee shall appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, on a date to be 
      fixed by the Hearings Office, which shall be no later than three months from the date this 
      Order becomes final. 
 
On July 10, 2009, Dr. Lee appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior 
Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to s. 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, 
the decision of the Discipline Committee is stayed pending the outcome of the appeal. 
 
On May 9, 2011, the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court) dismissed Dr. Lee's appeal.   
Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect. 
  
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 09 May 2011
Hearing Date(s): Nov 14, 2008

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 30, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joseph Siu-Kan Lee to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective June 30, 2016.

Dr. Lee has resigned from the College, effective June 30, 2016.
Download Full Document (PDF)