Lee, Joyce Wing-Yan (CPSO#: 76472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geriatrics Outpatient Services
North York General Hospital
2 Buchan Court
North York ON  M2J 5A3
Phone: (416) 756-6050 Ext. 8093
Fax: (416) 756-3144
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Yee Hong Medical Centre
Memory Program
2311 McNicoll Avenue
Toronto ON  M1V 5L3
Canada
Phone: (416) 940-4818
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Theal ( CPSO# 73982 )
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 76472 )

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 633-9420

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Suite 3SE-179
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE WING-YAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006