Lee, June Joo-Hyun (CPSO#: 89332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Lakeshore Road, Suite 5
St Catharines ON  L2N 7E4
Phone: 905-937-2220
Fax: 905-937-4404
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUNE JOO-HYUN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2013