Lee, Justin Ka-Pun (CPSO#: 91118)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014