Lee, Justin Tsu-Ping (CPSO#: 50913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10168 Yonge Street
Suite 201
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T6
Phone: (905) 770-1266
Fax: (905) 770-1270
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill Hosp
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Justin T. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 50913 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
10168 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T6
Phone Number: (905) 770-1266

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN TSU-PING LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1987