Lee, Justin Wann-Yee (CPSO#: 77648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin W.Y. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bennett ( CPSO# 76554 )
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 77648 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre T Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room T2-163
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 408-3677

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTIN WANN-YEE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009