Lee, Karen Kooi-Hua (CPSO#: 70304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Lenox Ave, Unit 916
NY NY  10026
United States
Phone: (404) 353-3860

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN KOOI-HUA LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2011