Lee, Kheng Hin (CPSO#: 56432)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Univ of Singapore, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 06 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988