Lee, Kit Shan (CPSO#: 86205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South East Toronto Family Health
Team
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone: (416) 469-6464 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 699-7766
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Crescentown Health Centre
4 The Market Place
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 690-3412
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kit Shan Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lee ( CPSO# 86205 )

Business Address:
South East Toronto Family Health Team
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone Number: (416) 699-7775

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
4 The Marketplace
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Phone Number: (416) 690-3412

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIT SHAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2010