Lee, Kyong-Jin (CPSO#: 61075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7326
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYONG-JIN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990