Lee, Kyong-Soon (CPSO#: 56809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 38102
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7488
Fax: (416) 813-5245
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYONG-SOON LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1987