Lee, Linda Li-Wen (CPSO#: 57134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: Chen, Linda Li-Wen (used until: 18 Feb 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Family Medicine
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0023
Fax: (519) 783-0033
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda L. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lee ( CPSO# 57134 )

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0023

Business Address:
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2B 4X6
Phone Number: (519) 578-2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA LI-WEN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987