Lee, Livia Kit-Ying (CPSO#: 82459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416)256-2737
Fax: (416) 256-9098
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Livia K.Y. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lee ( CPSO# 82459 )

Business Address:
404-960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-2737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIVIA KIT-YING LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010