Lee, Mark Ho (CPSO#: 58271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
22 Richmond Street
Unit 102
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3Y1
Phone: (905) 780-6626
Fax: (905) 780-6623
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Ho Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 58271 )

Business Address:
Unit 102
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3Y1
Phone Number: (905) 780-6626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK HO LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988