Lee, Mark Joon-Sung (CPSO#: 77748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
745 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Phone: (519) 624-8589
Fax: (519) 624-1879
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 650-2777
Fax: (519) 650-5577
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark J. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 77748 )
Dr. A. Sa ( CPSO# 89116 )

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
201-745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Phone Number: (519) 624-8589

Business Address:
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777


Corporation Name: Drs. Chan Flamand Kolyn Lee Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chan ( CPSO# 64970 )
Dr. F. Flamand ( CPSO# 62734 )
Dr. D. Kolyn ( CPSO# 59578 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 77748 )
Dr. A. Nguyen ( CPSO# 79450 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Business Address:
Suite 201
745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6

Business Address:
Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JOON-SUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2007