Lee, Michael Shun Wai (CPSO#: 26812)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 403 265 Yorkland Boulevard Toronto, ON M2J 5C7 Tel: 416 229 2399 Fax: 416 229 9771
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Pare for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 20 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2016