Lee, Moo-Hyung (CPSO#: 61187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Professional Building
679 Davis Drive, Suite 208
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 853-0731
Fax: (905) 853-0226
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moo-Hyung Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 61187 )

Business Address:
York Professional Building
Suite 208
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 853-0731

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOO-HYUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1992