Lee, Patricia Elaine (CPSO#: 63239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
B732
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6740
Fax: (416) 480-6741
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keith Jarvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lee ( CPSO# 63239 )
Dr. K. Jarvi ( CPSO# 50845 )

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-8867

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ELAINE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1991