Lee, Peter (CPSO#: 32024)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Otago, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014