Lee, Philip Edgar (CPSO#: 77427)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 13 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2004