Lee, Randall Todd (CPSO#: 61324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 603
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: (416) 266-4543
Fax: (416) 267-4050
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randall T. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lee ( CPSO# 61324 )

Business Address:
520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 603
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 266-4543

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANDALL TODD LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 26 Jul 1989
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 28 Feb 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1990