Lee, Richard David (CPSO#: 55739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Trafalgar Rd., #B4
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone: (905) 845-0014
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lee ( CPSO# 55739 )

Business Address:
Unit B4
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 407-7078

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD DAVID LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986