Lee, Robin Leighton (CPSO#: 50915)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Dec 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Dec 1994