Lee, Rose (CPSO#: 68147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
True North Imaging
Suite 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lee ( CPSO# 68147 )

Business Address:
Sheppard Ultrasound
Unit 5 & 6
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W2

Business Address:
Meadowvale Boulevard Imaging
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3

Business Address:
Kennedy Road Ultrasound
Suite 317
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2

Business Address:
Grandview X-Ray & Ultrasound
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7

Business Address:
Markham Mammography
39 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X3

Business Address:
Mobile Ultrasound
65 University Avenue East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2V9

Business Address:
Oakville Diagnostic Imaging
2035 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7S2

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Waterloo X-Ray & Ultrasound
65 University Avenue East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2V9

Business Address:
North York Ultrasound
4025 Yonge Street
Suite 215
Toronto ON  M2P 2E3
Phone Number: (416) 299-6887

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Canamera X-Ray & Ultrasound
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Suite B9
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7

Business Address:
Bloor East Ultrasound
160 Bloor Street East
15th Floor
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Phone Number: (416) 572-9392

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Markham Women's Imaging
39 Main Street North
Unit 1
Markham ON  L3P 1X3

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Toronto West Ultrasound
1560 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 1A6

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Franklin X-Ray & Ultrasound
1150 Franklin Boulevard
Suite 101
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Etobicoke Women's Imaging
110 Queen's Plate Drive
Unit 1 - 4
Etobicoke ON  M9W 0B4

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Midtown Diagnostic Imaging
1849 Yonge Street
Lower Level Room 6
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Thornhill Diagnostic Imaging
7330 Yonge Street
Suite 206
Thornhill ON  L4J 1V8

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Markham Reproductive Imaging
377 Church Street
Suite 305
Markham ON  L6B 1A1

Business Address:
True North Imaging
North Toronto Diagnostic Imaging-St.Clair
2938 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1W 2T4

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Victoria/Kitchener Ultrasound Mammography & X-Ray
751 Victoria Street South
Suite B2
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Fairway X-Ray & Ultrasound
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener ON  N2C 1X2

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Newmarket Women's Imaging
1111 Davis Drive
Unit 39
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8X2

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Reproductive Imaging
655 Bay Street
18th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSE LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1999