Lee, Sai Kui (CPSO#: 25430)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Mar 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 15, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Sai Kui Lee, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Sai Kui Lee:

(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of investigations under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the “Investigations”) by the College
(3) Hereby resign from the College effective 30 days from the date I execute this Undertaking (the "Effective Date").
(4) Hereby undertake not to apply or re apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(5) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have either applied, for registration as a physician in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to re commence the Investigation it terminated as a result of this undertaking, and/or proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(11) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public