Lee, Seon-Kyu (CPSO#: 75392)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 24 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seon Kyu Lee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 15 2008

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007